EP0241768 - Synthesizing word baseforms used in speech recognition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.1993 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bahl, Lalit Rai R.D. 1 Box 28 Elisha Purdy Road Amawalk, N.Y. 10501 / US | 02 /
Desouza, Peter Vincent 1301 White Hill Road Yorktown Heights, N.Y. 10598 / US | 03 /
Mercer, Robert Leroy 669 Viewland Drive Yorktown Heights, N.Y. 10598 / US | 04 /
Picheny, Michael Alan 118 Ralph Avenue White Plains New York 10606 / US | [1987/43] | Representative(s) | Jost, Ottokarl IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | Jost, Ottokarl, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 87104309.7 | 24.03.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | US19860853525 | 18.04.1986 Original published format: US 853525 | [1987/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0241768 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0241768 | Date: | 10.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241768 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G10L5/06 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
G10L15/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/43] | Title | German: | Erzeugung von Wortgrundstrukturen zur Spracherkennung | [1987/43] | English: | Synthesizing word baseforms used in speech recognition | [1987/43] | French: | Production de structures de base de mots pour la reconnaissance de la parole | [1987/43] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/16] | 31.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.05.1992 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 20.05.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ICASSP 84 PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, San Diego, California, 19th-21st March 1984, vol. 3, pages 35.6.1-35.6.4, IEEE; R. SCHWARTZ et al.: "Improved HIDDEN MARKOV MODELING of phonemes for continuous speech recognition" | [A] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, nr. 256, August 1985, page 418, abstract no. 25649, Emsworth, Hampshire, GB; "Composite fenemic phones" | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, vol. ASSP-28, no. 2, April 1980, pages 129-136, IEEE, New York, US; S. FURUI: "A training procedure for isolated word recognition systems" | [A] - ICASSP 84 PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, San Diego, California, 19th-21st March 1984, pages 42.5.1-42.5.4, IEEE; J.M. LUCASSEN et al.: "An information theoretic approach to the automatic determination of phonemic baseforms" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 4, September 1981, pages 2042-2043, New York, US; L.R. BAHL et al.: "Automatic selection of speech prototypes" |