EP0245623 - Tube-bending machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schwarze, Rigobert, Dipl.-Ing. Olpener Strasse 460-474 D-51109 Köln / DE | [1987/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/47] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1988/12] | Selting, Günther Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1988/08] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1987/47] | Baur, Eduard, Dr.-Ing. Dipl.-Ing. Werderstrasse 3 D-5000 Köln 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 87104356.8 | 24.03.1987 | [1987/47] | Priority number, date | DE19863616302 | 14.05.1986 Original published format: DE 3616302 | [1987/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0245623 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0245623 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0245623 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B21D7/024, B21D7/02 | [1987/47] | CPC: |
B21D7/021 (EP,US);
B21D7/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/47] | Title | German: | Rohrbiegemaschine | [1987/47] | English: | Tube-bending machine | [1987/47] | French: | Machine à plier des tubes | [1987/47] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1993/41: Teilanmeldung 92113248.6 eingereicht am 24/03/87 | EPB 1993/41: Divisional application 92113248.6 filed on 24/03/87 | EPB 1993/41: Demande divisionnaire 92113248.6 déposée le 24/03/87 | Examination procedure | 28.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 24.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP92113248.6 / EP0513864 | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 22.11.1987 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | 25.01.1988 | Resumption of proceedings | Documents cited: | Search | EP0200979 [ ] (SCHWARZE RIGOBERT); | FR2530980 [ ] (EATON LEONARD CORP [US]); | GB545810 [ ] (ARTHUR LARUE PARKER); | DE1297064 [ ] (HILGERS MASCHINEN U APP BAUANS) |