EP0243684 - Turn-off power semiconductor device and method of making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.1994 [1994/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBC Aktiengesellschaft Brown, Boveri & Cie. Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | [1987/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gobrecht, Jens, Dr. Brühlstrasse 37 CH-5412 Gebenstorf / CH | 02 /
Grüning, Horst, Dr. Im Ergel 10 CH-5400 Baden / CH | 03 /
Voboril, Jan Landschreiberstrasse 2 CH-5415 Nussbaumen / CH | [1987/45] | Application number, filing date | 87104460.8 | 26.03.1987 | [1987/45] | Priority number, date | CH19860001775 | 30.04.1986 Original published format: CH 177586 | [1987/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0243684 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0243684 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/10, H01L29/60, H01L29/74, H01L29/72, H01L21/308, H01L29/04 | [1987/45] | CPC: |
H01L29/7392 (EP,US);
H01L29/045 (EP,US);
H01L29/1066 (EP,US);
H01L29/41716 (EP,US);
H01L29/42308 (EP,US);
H01L29/42312 (EP,US);
H01L29/744 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/45] | Title | German: | Abschaltbares Leistungshalbleiterbauelement und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1987/45] | English: | Turn-off power semiconductor device and method of making the same | [1987/45] | French: | Elément semi-conducteur de puissance à extinction et méthode de fabrication | [1987/45] | Examination procedure | 22.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/25] | 17.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 11.12.1992 | Appeal received | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 26.05.1993 | SE | 26.05.1993 | [1994/02] |
Former [1994/01] | NL | 26.05.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58071656 ; | [A]JP57201078 ; | [Y]US4571815 (BALIGA BANTVAL J [US], et al); | [Y]GB2071912 (GTE LABORATORIES INC); | [A]US4375124 (COGAN ADRIAN I); | [A]US4037245 (FERRO ARMAND P); | [A]EP0178387 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 162 (E-187)[1307], 15. Juli 1983; & JP-A-58 071 656 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 28-04-1983, & JP58071656 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 52 (E-162)[1197], 2. März 1983; & JP-A-57 201 078 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 09-12-1982, & JP57201078 A 00000000 |