EP0241779 - Acid composition for washing the exterior of railway carriages and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAMPI Centro Applicazione Moderni Prodotti Industriali Srl via Cadriano 2 I-40057 Cadriano di Granarolo Emilia Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states CAMPI Centro Applicazione Moderni Prodotti Industriali Srl via Cadriano 2 I-40057 Cadriano di Granarolo Emilia Bologna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campagna, Gianni Via Borselli 6/7 I-40135 Bologna / IT | [1987/43] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1987/43] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr., et al NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI Srl 33, Viale Bianca Maria I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 87104462.4 | 26.03.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | IT19860020106 | 16.04.1986 Original published format: IT 2010686 | [1987/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0241779 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0241779 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241779 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C11D7/08, C11D7/26, C23G1/02 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
C11D3/222 (EP);
C11D7/08 (EP);
C11D7/263 (EP);
C11D7/265 (EP);
C11D7/3227 (EP);
C23G1/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/43] | Title | German: | Saure Zusammensetzung zum Waschen der Aussenseite von Eisenbahnwagen und dergleichen | [1987/43] | English: | Acid composition for washing the exterior of railway carriages and the like | [1987/43] | French: | Composition acide pour laver l'extérieur de wagons de chemin de fer et semblables | [1987/43] | Examination procedure | 03.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/24] | 26.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.07.1992 | BE | 29.07.1992 | CH | 29.07.1992 | GR | 29.07.1992 | LI | 29.07.1992 | NL | 29.07.1992 | SE | 29.07.1992 | GB | 26.03.1993 | LU | 31.03.1993 | [2000/04] |
Former [1997/17] | AT | 29.07.1992 | |
BE | 29.07.1992 | ||
CH | 29.07.1992 | ||
LI | 29.07.1992 | ||
NL | 29.07.1992 | ||
SE | 29.07.1992 | ||
GB | 26.03.1993 | ||
Former [1994/22] | AT | 29.07.1992 | |
BE | 29.07.1992 | ||
CH | 29.07.1992 | ||
LI | 29.07.1992 | ||
NL | 29.07.1992 | ||
SE | 29.07.1992 | ||
GB | 26.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/16] | AT | 29.07.1992 | |
BE | 29.07.1992 | ||
CH | 29.07.1992 | ||
LI | 29.07.1992 | ||
NL | 29.07.1992 | ||
SE | 29.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | AT | 29.07.1992 | |
CH | 29.07.1992 | ||
LI | 29.07.1992 | ||
NL | 29.07.1992 | ||
SE | 29.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/11] | CH | 29.07.1992 | |
LI | 29.07.1992 | ||
SE | 29.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/10] | CH | 29.07.1992 | |
LI | 29.07.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1908032 (FARBENKRAUTH & CO); | [A]AU431227B ; | [A]DE2413870 (BENCKISER GMBH JOH A) |