EP0239931 - Process and reagent for the determination of substrates or enzyme activities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1993 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH D-68298 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Town, Michael-Harold, Dr.rer.nat. Waldstrasse 45 D-8125 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
Siedel, Joachim, Dr.rer.nat. Bahnhofstrasse 6 D-8131 Bernried / DE | 03 /
Ziegenhorn, Joachim Dr.rer.nat. Ina-Seidel-Weg 1 D-8130 Starnberg / DE | [1987/41] | Application number, filing date | 87104466.5 | 26.03.1987 | [1987/41] | Priority number, date | DE19863611227 | 04.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3611227 | [1987/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0239931 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0239931 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0239931 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D257/04, C12Q1/26 | [1987/41] | CPC: |
C07D257/04 (EP,US);
C12Q1/26 (EP,US);
C12Q1/28 (EP,US);
C12Q2326/92 (EP,US);
Y10S435/805 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Reagenz zur Bestimmung von Substraten oder Enzymaktivitäten | [1987/41] | English: | Process and reagent for the determination of substrates or enzyme activities | [1987/41] | French: | Procédé et réactif pour la détermination de substrats ou d'activités enzymatiques | [1987/41] | Examination procedure | 26.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/41] | 18.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 18.03.1992 | NL | 18.03.1992 | SE | 18.03.1992 | LU | 31.03.1992 | ES | 29.06.1992 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | GR | 18.03.1992 | |
NL | 18.03.1992 | ||
SE | 18.03.1992 | ||
LU | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | NL | 18.03.1992 | |
SE | 18.03.1992 | ||
LU | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/48] | NL | 18.03.1992 | |
SE | 18.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/47] | SE | 18.03.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2713581 (PANNONE LAURA J, et al); | [X]GB738585 (MAY & BAKER LTD); | [X]US3071465 (FRITZ DERSCH, et al); | [X]DE2147466 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH); | [X]GB1513488 (LUSHINA O, et al); | [X]EP0127179 (WAKO PURE CHEM IND LTD [JP]); | [X]EP0167973 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) | Examination | EP0037466 |