EP0239933 - Pressure transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DYNISCO, INC. Ten Oceana Way Norwood Massachusetts 02062 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | For all designated states DYNISCO, INC. Ten Oceana Way Norwood Massachusetts 02062 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wareham, William 27 Beach Street Marion Massachusetts 02738 / US | [1987/41] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 87104481.4 | 26.03.1987 | [1987/41] | Priority number, date | US19860848300 | 04.04.1986 Original published format: US 848300 | US19860918087 | 14.10.1986 Original published format: US 918087 | [1987/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0239933 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0239933 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0239933 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/04, G01L9/00, G01L19/00 | [1989/29] | CPC: |
G01L19/0046 (EP,US);
G01L9/04 (EP,KR,US);
G01L19/0007 (EP,US);
G01L19/04 (EP,US);
G01L19/06 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1987/41] | G01L9/04, G01L19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/41] | Title | German: | Druckwandler | [1987/41] | English: | Pressure transducer | [1987/41] | French: | Transducteur de pression | [1987/41] | Examination procedure | 12.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/06] | 07.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.05.1993 | BE | 12.05.1993 | CH | 12.05.1993 | LI | 12.05.1993 | NL | 12.05.1993 | SE | 12.05.1993 | ES | 23.08.1993 | [2004/03] |
Former [1994/25] | AT | 12.05.1993 | |
BE | 12.05.1993 | ||
CH | 12.05.1993 | ||
LI | 12.05.1993 | ||
NL | 12.05.1993 | ||
SE | 12.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/09] | BE | 12.05.1993 | |
CH | 12.05.1993 | ||
LI | 12.05.1993 | ||
NL | 12.05.1993 | ||
SE | 12.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/04] | CH | 12.05.1993 | |
LI | 12.05.1993 | ||
NL | 12.05.1993 | ||
SE | 12.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/02] | NL | 12.05.1993 | |
SE | 12.05.1993 | ||
Former [1993/52] | NL | 12.05.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1305343 ; | [YP]EP0187385 (BOFORS ELECTRONICS INC [US]); | [Y]US4369659 (WAREHAM WILLIAM M); | [A]DE2808469 (BROSA ERICH) |