EP0241787 - 2,5-Substituted dihydroresorcinol ether derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.1989 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keil, Michael, Dr. Fontanestrasse 4 D-6713 Freinsheim / DE | 02 /
Schirmer, Ulrich, Dr. Berhalde 79 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Kolassa, Dieter, Dr. Moltkestrasse 8 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
Wuerzer, Bruno, Dr. Ruedigerstrasse 13 D-6701 Otterstadt / DE | 05 /
Meyer, Norbert, Dr. Dossenheimer Weg 22 D-6802 Ladenburg / DE | [1987/43] | Application number, filing date | 87104553.0 | 27.03.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | DE19863611418 | 05.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3611418 | [1987/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0241787 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C131/00, A01N37/22 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
A01N37/22 (EP);
A01N37/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/43] | Title | German: | 2,5-Substituierte-Dihydroresorcinenoletherderivate | [1987/43] | English: | 2,5-Substituted dihydroresorcinol ether derivatives | [1987/43] | French: | Dérivés d'énoléthers de 2,5-dihydrorésorcinol | [1987/43] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 18.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/43] | 27.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0085529 [ ] (ICI AUSTRALIA LTD [AU]); | EP0209283 [ ] (ICI AUSTRALIA LTD [AU]); | EP0133349 [ ] (ICI AUSTRALIA LTD [AU]); | EP0169521 [ ] (BASF AG [DE]); | EP0136703 [ ] (BASF AG [DE]) |