blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0240904

EP0240904 - Process for the preparation of solid pharmaceutical forms [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.05.1993
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.06.1993 [1993/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/42]For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Goertz, Hans-Helmut, Dr.
Am Wurmberg 11
D-6713 Freinsheim / DE
02 / Klimesch, Roger Guenther, Dr.
Georg Froeba-Str. 43
D-6146 Alsbach-Haehnlein 2 / DE
03 / Laemmerhirt, Klaus, Dr.
Am Boehler Wald 5
D-6737 Boehl-Iggelheim / DE
04 / Lang, Siegfried, Dr.
Thomas Mann-Str. 22
D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE
05 / Sanner, Axel, Dr.
Lorscher Ring 2 c
D-6710 Frankenthal / DE
06 / Spengler, Reinhard, Dr.
Comeniusstr. 6
D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE
[1992/27]
Former [1987/42]01 / Goertz, Hans-Helmut, Dr.
Am Wurmberg 11
D-6713 Freinsheim / DE
02 / Klimesch, Roger Guenther, Dr.
Georg-Froeba-strasse 43
D-6146 Alsbach-Haehnlein 2 / DE
03 / Laemmerhirt, Klaus, Dr.
Am Boehler Wald 5
D-6737 Boehl-Iggelheim / DE
04 / Lang, Siegfried, Dr.
Thomas-Mann-Strasse 22
D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE
05 / Sanner, Axel, Dr.
Lorscher Ring 2 c
D-6710 Frankenthal / DE
06 / Spengler, Reinhard, Dr.
Comeniusstrasse 6
D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE
Application number, filing date87104724.731.03.1987
[1987/42]
Priority number, dateDE1986361221211.04.1986         Original published format: DE 3612212
[1987/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0240904
Date:14.10.1987
Language:DE
[1987/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0240904
Date:30.11.1988
Language:DE
[1988/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0240904
Date:01.07.1992
Language:DE
[1992/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.10.1988
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/20, A61K47/00, A61J3/06
[1987/42]
CPC:
A61K9/2095 (EP,US); A61K9/20 (KR); A61K9/2027 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0035 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1987/42]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von festen pharmazeutischen Formen[1987/42]
English:Process for the preparation of solid pharmaceutical forms[1987/42]
French:Procédé pour la préparation de formes pharmaceutiques solides[1987/42]
Examination procedure09.11.1988Examination requested  [1989/01]
05.03.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
30.08.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.12.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.1992Fee for grant paid
10.03.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.04.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
19.03.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YD]DE1229248  (CIBA GEIGY);
 [Y]EP0104042  (GAF CORP [US]);
 [Y]EP0121874  (BASF AG [DE]);
 [A]EP0125420  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM LTD [US]);
 [XP]EP0204596  (RHONE POULENC SANTE [FR]);
 [XP]EP0214092  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.