EP0243734 - Optically active hydantoin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1992 [1992/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 253 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Postfach, Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poetsch, Eike, Dr. Am Buchwald 4 D-6109 Mühltal 6 / DE | 02 /
Casutt, Michael, Dr. Adolf-Kolping-Strasse 19 D-6102 Pfungstadt / DE | [1987/45] | Application number, filing date | 87105057.1 | 06.04.1987 | [1987/45] | Priority number, date | DE19863613246 | 19.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3613246 | DE19873703871 | 07.02.1987 Original published format: DE 3703871 | [1987/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0243734 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0243734 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0243734 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D513/04, C07D498/04, // A61K31/425 ,(C07D513/04, 277:00, 235:00),(C07D498/04, 263:00, 235:00) | [1987/45] | CPC: |
C07D513/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/45] | Title | German: | Optisch aktive Hydantoine | [1987/45] | English: | Optically active hydantoin | [1987/45] | French: | Hydantoine optiquement active | [1987/45] | Examination procedure | 03.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 19.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2425306 (YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL); | [A]AT341525B (YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]); | [A]US4009172 (BAGGIOLINI ENRICO, et al) | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS. Band 105, Nr. 13, 29 September 1986, Seite 674, Zusammenfassungsnr. 115004h, Columbus, Ohio, US; A.V. EREMEEV et al.: "Reaction of 1,3-thiazolidine-4- and 1,4-tetrahydrothiazine-3-carboxylate esters with isocyanates and isothiocyanates and structure the reaction products", & KHIM GETEROTSIKL. DOEDIN 1985 (10), 1327-1332 | [T] - CHIMIA 41. Nr. 5, Mai 1987, Seiten 148-150; E. POETSCH et al.: "Stereoselektive Synthesewege zu (+)-Biotin aus L-Cystein". |