EP0248996 - Tandem-axle unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1990 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.1991 [1991/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bergische Achsenfabrik Fr. Kotz & Söhne Am Ohlerhammer 51674 Wiehl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/51] | For all designated states Bergische Achsenfabrik Fr. Kotz & Söhne Am Ohlerhammer D-51674 Wiehl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steiner, Helmut Freiherr von Stein-Strasse 1 D-5276 Wiehl / DE | [1987/51] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/51] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 87105102.5 | 07.04.1987 | [1987/51] | Priority number, date | DE19863615773 | 10.05.1986 Original published format: DE 3615773 | [1987/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0248996 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0248996 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60G5/04 | [1987/51] | CPC: |
B60G11/107 (EP,US);
B60G5/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/16] |
Former [1990/12] | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, NL, SE | ||
Former [1987/51] | BE, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verbundachsaggregat | [1987/51] | English: | Tandem-axle unit | [1987/51] | French: | Ensemble d'essieux en tandem | [1987/51] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 24.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE951975 (LUDEWIG GMBH GEB); | [A]US3123377 ; | [Y]DE1480019 (SONTHEIMER GEORG); | [A]DE1555983 (KAESSBOHRER FAHRZEUG KARL); | [A]GB1244843 (LAMBERT ALFRED WALTER); | [A]US3767222 (WILLETTS E); | [Y]US3833236 (DAVIS R, et al) |