EP0244654 - Easy-out threaded fastener extractor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alden Corporation Munson and Wolcott Roads Wolcott, CT 06716 / US | [1991/09] |
Former [1987/46] | For all designated states Polonsky, Eli 1608 South Kenton Aurora Colorado 80012 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/26] |
Former [1991/10] | 01 /
* * * | ||
Former [1987/46] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/46] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 D-90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87105117.3 | 07.04.1987 | [1987/46] | Priority number, date | US19860861342 | 09.05.1986 Original published format: US 861342 | [1987/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0244654 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0244654 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B25B27/18 | [1987/46] | CPC: |
B25B27/18 (EP,US);
B25B29/00 (KR);
Y10T408/907 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/46] | Title | German: | Gerät zum leichteren Ausziehen von Schraubenteilen | [1987/46] | English: | Easy-out threaded fastener extractor | [1987/46] | French: | Appareil pour extraire plus facilement des pièces de vis | [1987/46] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/24] | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2752671 [ ] (LOUIS ALYEA); | US2951406 [ ] (GEORGE BRASE); | DE2915197 [ ] (DOROSH MICHAEL) |