EP0242735 - Valve device with a vent for compressed-air brakes of vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1989 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE AG Postfach 40 10 60 80710 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/44] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE AG Postfach 40 10 60 D-80710 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Skach, Kuno Koschatgasse 34 A-1190 Wien / AT | [1987/44] | Application number, filing date | 87105312.0 | 10.04.1987 | [1987/44] | Priority number, date | DE19863612993 | 17.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3612993 | DE19863614845 | 02.05.1986 Original published format: DE 3614845 | [1987/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0242735 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0242735 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0242735 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/00, B60T8/22 | [1987/44] | CPC: |
B60T8/1818 (EP);
B60T17/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/44] | Title | German: | Ventileinrichtung mit einer Entlüftung für Druckluftbremsen von Fahrzeugen | [1987/44] | English: | Valve device with a vent for compressed-air brakes of vehicles | [1987/44] | French: | Dispositif de valve ayant une ventilation pour freins à air comprimé de véhicules | [1987/44] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/04] | 16.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 04.01.1989 | IT | 04.01.1989 | [2007/52] |
Former [2000/03] | GB | 04.01.1989 | |
IT | 04.01.1989 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 04.01.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2058653 ; | [AD]DE1605254 ; | [AD]DE1605275 |