EP0241044 - Construction of new alpha-galactosidase producing yeast strains and the industrial application of these strains [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.06.1999 [1999/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALKO Group Ltd. Salmisaarenranta 7 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | For all designated states Alko Group Ltd. Salmisaarenranta 7 SF-00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [1987/42] | For all designated states Alko Ltd. P.O. Box 350 SF-00101 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liljeström, Pirkko Liisa Pallokuja 4 as 14 SF-01280 Vantaa / FI | 02 /
Tubb, Roy Stephen c/o 12 Curzon Close Walmer Deal Kent CT14 7SL / GB | 03 /
Korhola, Matti Pellervo Lehtotie 8 SF-00630 Helsinki / FI | [1987/42] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87105332.8 | 10.04.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | FI19860001548 | 11.04.1986 Original published format: FI 861548 | [1987/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0241044 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0241044 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241044 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/81, C12N1/18, C12N9/40 | [1997/29] | CPC: |
C12C5/004 (EP);
C12C11/003 (EP);
C12N1/18 (EP);
C12N15/10 (EP);
C12N15/81 (EP);
C12N15/90 (EP);
C12N9/2465 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1987/42] | C12N15/00, C12N1/18, C12N9/40 | Title | German: | Konstruktion alpha-Galaktosidase produzierender Hefestämme und deren industrielle Verwendung | [1987/42] | English: | Construction of new alpha-galactosidase producing yeast strains and the industrial application of these strains | [1987/42] | French: | Construction de souches de levure qui produisent l'alpha-galactosidase, ainsi que leur application industrielle | [1987/42] | Examination procedure | 22.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 02.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 03.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1990 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.07.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | PRIMALCO OY P.O. Box 808 00101 Helsinki / FI | Date: | 07.08.1995 | [1995/41] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.07.1997 | BE | 16.07.1997 | CH | 16.07.1997 | LI | 16.07.1997 | SE | 16.10.1997 | GB | 10.04.1998 | [1999/25] | Documents cited: | Search | EP0066857 [ ] (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) | [ ] - Molecular and Cellular Biology, Vol. 4, No. 7, July 1984, pages 1238-1245; Washington, US, M.A. POST-BEITTENMILLER et al.: "Regulation of basal and induced levels of the MEL1 transcript in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", page 1240, column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 8. | [ ] - Gene, Vol. 34, 1985, pages 325-334; Elsevier, Amsterdam, NL, P. MEADEN et al.: "A DEX gene conferring production of extracellular amyloglucosidase on yeast", "Introduction". | [ ] - Nucleic Acids Research, Vol. 13, No. 20, 1985, pages 7257-7267; Oxford, GB, P.L. LILJESTROM: "The nucleotide sequence of the yeast MEL1 gene", Abstract. | [ ] - Journal of the Institute of Brewing, Vol. 92, November-December 1986, pages 588-590; R.S. TUBB et al.: "A colony-colour method which differentiates alpha-galactosidase-positive strains of yeast", whole article. | [ ] - Fems Microbiology Letters, Vol. 34, March 20, 1986, pages 179-185; Amsterdam, NL, H. RUOHOLA et al.: "Expression and regulation of the yeast MEL1 gene", whole document. | [ ] - Journal of the Institute of Brewing, Vol. 89, No. 3, May-June 1983, pages 170-188; London, GB, G.G. STEWART et al.: "Current developments in the genetic manipulation of brewing yeast strains - A review". | Examination | - YEAST, vol. 1, 1985; S.A. PARENT et al., pp. 83-138 | - P.L. SUOMINEN, "Characterisation & Applications of the Yeast MEL1 Gene", Academic Dissertation, 1988, Helsinki (FI); p. 29 | - YEAST GENETICS, EBC Congress 1985; P.G. MEADEN et al., pp. 219-226 | - APPLIED & ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 54, no. 1, January 1988; P.L. LILJESTRÖM-SUOMINEN et al., pp. 245-249 | - GENE EXPRESSION IN YEAST, Proceedings of the Aloko Yeast Symposium, 1983, Helsinki (FI); M. KORHOLA et al., pp. 231-242 |