EP0249706 - Clothing for textile preparation machines, in particular combing machines, carding machines or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Staedtler & Uhl Nördliche Ringstrasse 12 D-91126 Schwabach / DE | [1987/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egerer, Josef Beim Biengarten 2b D-8540 Schwabach / DE | [1987/52] | Representative(s) | Schneck, Herbert, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | Schneck, Herbert, Dipl.-Phys., Dr., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87105371.6 | 10.04.1987 | [1987/52] | Priority number, date | DE19863620702 | 20.06.1986 Original published format: DE 3620702 | [1987/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0249706 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0249706 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D01G19/10, D01G15/88 | [1987/52] | CPC: |
D01G15/88 (EP);
D01G19/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/52] | Title | German: | Garnitur für Textilvorbereitungsmaschinen, insbesondere Kämm-Maschinen, Karden o. dgl. | [1987/52] | English: | Clothing for textile preparation machines, in particular combing machines, carding machines or the like | [1987/52] | French: | Garniture pour machines textiles de préparation, notamment pour peigneuses, machines de cardage ou analogues | [1987/52] | File destroyed: | 01.02.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.04.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/48] | 06.07.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.05.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2165561 ; | [X]CS161415 ; | [A]GB695606 ; | [A]GB1155605 |