EP0242745 - Method and apparatus for controlling the chemical state of an electroless plating bath [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/44] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McBride, Donald Gene 2058 Cheshire Road Binghamton, N.Y. 13903 / US | 02 /
Rickert, Robert George 2705 Foster Street Endwell, N.Y. 13760 / US | [1987/44] | Representative(s) | Mönig, Anton IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1987/44] | Oechssler, Dietrich, Dr. rer. nat. IBM Deutschland GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-71032 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87105380.7 | 10.04.1987 | [1987/44] | Priority number, date | US19860854262 | 21.04.1986 Original published format: US 854262 | [1987/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0242745 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0242745 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C23C18/31, C23C18/38 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
C23C18/1683 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/44] | C23C18/46 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kontrolle des chemischen Zustandes von einem chemischen Metallisierungsbad | [1987/44] | English: | Method and apparatus for controlling the chemical state of an electroless plating bath | [1987/44] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour contrôler l'état chimique d'un bain de métallisation sans courant | [1987/44] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/16] | 31.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 04.07.1990 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 04.07.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59226171 ; | [A]JP53048939 ; | [A]DE2757458 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP) | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 127, no. 2, February 1980, pages 365-369, Princeton; M. PAUNOVIC: "An electrochemical control system for electroless copper bath" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 97, no. 3, 19th July 1982, page 629, abstract no. 225424u, Columbus, Ohio, US; I. OHNO et al.: "Electrochemical impedance measurements applied to the study of electroless plating", & AES ELECTROLESS PLAT. SYMP., 1st 1982, Paper 16, 12 pp. | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 96, no. 20, 17th May 1982, page 582, abstract no. 171085t, Columbus, Ohio, US; I. OHNO et al.: "Electrochemical monitoring of instantaneous rate in electroless plating", & MET. AUSTRALAS. 1982, 14(2), 18-21, 23 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 96 (C-278)[1819), 25th April 1985; & JP-A-59 226 171 (BROTHER KOGYO K.K.) 19-12-1984, & JP59226171 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 89, no. 22, 27th November 1978, page 277, abstract no. 184516q, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-53 048 939 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO., LTD) 02-05-1978, & JP53048939 A 00000000 |