EP0253956 - An addressing technique for providing simultaneous read modify and write operations with serpentine configured rams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.1996 [1996/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA INC. Motorola Center 1303 Algonquin Rd. Schaumburg Illinois 60196 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/04] | For all designated states MOTOROLA INC. Motorola Center 1303 Algonquin Rd. Schaumburg Illinois 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thompson, Charles D. 7215 Chuck Wagon Trail Austin Texas 78749 / US | 02 /
Gergen, Joseph P. 3816 South Lamar No. 3702 Austin Texas 78704 / US | [1988/04] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Peter David Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | Hudson, Peter David Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [1988/04] | Hudson, Peter David Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 87105435.9 | 13.04.1987 | [1988/04] | Priority number, date | US19860878926 | 26.06.1986 Original published format: US 878926 | [1988/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0253956 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0253956 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0253956 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/06 | [1988/04] | CPC: |
G06F12/0607 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1988/04] | Title | German: | Adressierungsverfahren für gleichzeitige Lese-, Änderungs- und Schreib-Operationen mit schlangenförmiger RAM-Konfiguration | [1988/04] | English: | An addressing technique for providing simultaneous read modify and write operations with serpentine configured rams | [1988/04] | French: | Méthode d'adressage permettant des opérations de lecture, de modification et d'écriture simultanées avec des RAM à configuration serpentine | [1988/04] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 15.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0032136 (HONEYWELL INF SYSTEMS [US]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 4, no. 11, April 1962, pages 43-44, New York, US; G.H. BUSH et al.: "Revolving storage addresses" | [A] - THE 13TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM OM COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE, Tokyo, 2nd - 5th JUne 1986, pages 324-328, IEEE, Washington, US; D.T. HARPER et al.: "Performance evaluation of vector accesses in parallel memories using a skewed storage scheme" |