EP0243782 - Operation control desk [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.03.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | For all designated states NIPPON METAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 1-1 Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPON METAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 1-1 Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamoto, Hiroyuki 1-7, Kamiyabe-2-chome Sagamihara-shi / JP | 02 /
Nagase, Hidenori 8-14, Makigahara Asahi-ku Yokohama / JP | 03 /
Kamigane, Yoshihiro 15-17, Osecho-3-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 04 /
Kawase, Hiroshi 33-2, Nishinarusawacho-1-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 05 /
Sakurai, Takakazu 2106-5, Motoyoshidacho Mito-shi / JP | [1987/45] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87105482.1 | 13.04.1987 | [1987/45] | Priority number, date | JP19860100986 | 02.05.1986 Original published format: JP 10098686 | [1987/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0243782 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0243782 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/02 | [1989/01] | CPC: |
G05B19/108 (EP);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06F3/0238 (EP);
H02B15/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1987/45] | G06F3/023 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1987/45] | Title | German: | Operationssteuerpult | [1987/45] | English: | Operation control desk | [1987/45] | French: | Pupitre de commande d'opérations | [1987/45] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/33] | 06.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/19] | 19.12.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8602473 (NCR CO [US]); | [X]EP0101211 (FANUC LTD [JP]); | [A]US4333097 (BURIC MILORAD R, et al); | [A]US4425627 (EIBNER JULES A [US]) |