EP0241906 - Layered keyboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilhelm Ruf KG Schwanthalerstrasse 18 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states Wilhelm Ruf KG Schwanthaler Strasse 18 D-80336 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffman, Horst Gut Sonnenhausen D-8019 Glonn / DE | [1987/43] | Representative(s) | von Bülow, Tam, et al Am Klueshoff 22 24955 Harrislee / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | von Bülow, Tam, Dr., et al Patentanwalt Mailänder Strasse 13 D-81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87105500.0 | 14.04.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | DE19860010553U | 17.04.1986 Original published format: DE 8610553 U | [1987/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0241906 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0241906 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241906 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/70 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
H01H13/80 (EP,US);
H01H13/702 (EP,US);
H01H13/703 (EP,US);
H01H2201/008 (EP,US);
H01H2203/032 (EP,US);
H01H2209/01 (EP,US);
H01H2209/014 (EP,US);
H01H2211/02 (EP,US);
H01H2229/036 (EP,US);
H01H2229/042 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/43] | Title | German: | Membrantastatur | [1987/43] | English: | Layered keyboard | [1987/43] | French: | Clavier à membrane | [1987/43] | Examination procedure | 25.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/34] | 19.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 14.04.1993 | SE | 15.04.1993 | [1994/22] |
Former [1994/09] | SE | 15.04.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2046612 (LEMATEX INC); | [A]DE2805722 (CHOMERICS INC); | [Y]DE3108183 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [XP]DE8610553U |