EP0242850 - Water soluble monoazo compounds, process for their preparation and their use as dyestuffs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/44] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Russ, Werner Hubert, Dr. Berliner Strasse 10 D-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | [1987/44] | Application number, filing date | 87105844.2 | 21.04.1987 | [1987/44] | Priority number, date | DE19863614045 | 25.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3614045 | [1987/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0242850 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C09B62/51, D06P1/384 | [1987/44] | CPC: |
C09B29/00 (KR);
C09B62/51 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/44] | Title | German: | Wasserlösliche Monoazoverbindungen, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Farbstoffe | [1987/44] | English: | Water soluble monoazo compounds, process for their preparation and their use as dyestuffs | [1987/44] | French: | Composés monoazoiques solubles dans l'eau, leur procédé de préparation et leur utilisation comme colorants | [1987/44] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 12.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/06] | 28.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 23.06.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0051808 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |