EP0246461 - Junction element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.1992 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.12.1992 [1992/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bergische Achsenfabrik Fr. Kotz & Söhne Am Ohlerhammer 51674 Wiehl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/48] | For all designated states Bergische Achsenfabrik Fr. Kotz & Söhne Am Ohlerhammer D-51674 Wiehl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holländer, K.E. Im Krahnöchel 9 D-5276 Wiehl / DE | 02 /
Steiner, H. Freiherr v. Stein-Strasse 1 D-5276 Wiehl / DE | [1987/48] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/48] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 87105919.2 | 22.04.1987 | [1987/48] | Priority number, date | DE19863616998 | 21.05.1986 Original published format: DE 3616998 | [1987/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0246461 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0246461 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0246461 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B62D13/04, B62D7/18 | [1989/04] | CPC: |
B62D13/04 (EP,US);
B60G2204/41 (EP,US);
B60G2204/42 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/48] | B62D13/04 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/48] | Title | German: | Verbundachsaggregat | [1987/48] | English: | Junction element | [1987/48] | French: | Elément de liaison | [1987/48] | Examination procedure | 27.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 27.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE1810261 (BERGISCHE ACHSEN KOTZ SOEHNE); | [Y]US1349653 (BENSON JESSE M); | [A]FR2335359 (FRUEHAUF FRANCE [FR]) |