Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.12.1992 [1992/49] |
25.10.1991 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.12.1991 [1991/50] |
24.07.1990 | First examination report | |
07.02.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.03.1989 [1989/13] |
28.12.1988 | Publication of search report | published on 15.02.1989 [1989/07] |
08.12.1988 | Change - classification | published on 25.01.1989 [1989/04] |
10.10.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.11.1987 [1987/48] |