Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3775111D1 | 23.01.1992 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3775111 | 22.04.1987 | DE3616998 | 21.05.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU582965B | Global Dossier | 13.04.1989 | B2 | AU7310687 | 26.11.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3616998 | 21.05.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0246461 | Global Dossier | 11.12.1991 | B1 | EP0246461 | 15.02.1989 | A3 | EP0246461 | 25.11.1987 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3616998 | 21.05.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1286326 | 16.07.1991 | C | Priority number | Date | DE3616998 | 21.05.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3616998 | 26.11.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3616998 | 21.05.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2028822T | 16.07.1992 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE3616998 | 21.05.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4786114 | 22.11.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3616998 | 21.05.1986 |