EP0243880 - Silicon carbide as a raw material for silicon production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1991 [1991/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION P.O. Box 1767 Midland Michigan 48640 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION P.O. Box 1767 Midland Michigan 48640 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dosaj, Vishu Dutt 705 Sylvan Lane Midland Michigan / US | 02 /
Rauchholz, Alvin William 1434 S. Orr Road Hemlock Michigan / US | 03 /
YOUNG Martin David 365, North 5 Miles Road Midland, Michigan, 48640 / US | [1990/04] |
Former [1987/45] | 01 /
Dosaj, Vishu Dutt 705 Sylvan Lane Midland Michigan / US | ||
02 /
Rauchholz, Alvin William 1434 S. Orr Road Hemlock Michigan / US | Representative(s) | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, et al Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 87105962.2 | 23.04.1987 | [1987/45] | Priority number, date | US19860857207 | 29.04.1986 Original published format: US 857207 | [1987/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0243880 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0243880 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/02 | [1987/45] | CPC: |
C01B33/025 (EP);
Y02P20/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/45] | Title | German: | Siliciumkarbid als Ausgangsmaterial für die Erzeugung von Silicium | [1987/45] | English: | Silicon carbide as a raw material for silicon production | [1987/45] | French: | Carbure de silicium comme produit de départ pour la production de silicium | [1987/45] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 13.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP49037686 ; | [X]EP0177894 (SAMIM ABRASIVI S P A [IT], et al); | [X]FR1310789 (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | [XP]EP0208567 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) | [Y] - ELEKTROWÄRME INTERNATIONAL, vol. 34, no. B2, April 1976, pages B81-B84, Essen, DE; G. RATH et al.: "Erzeugung von hochprozentigem Ferrosilicium und Silicium-Metall im Elektroreduktionsofen" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 82, no. 24, 16th June 1975, page 180, abstract no. 159017a, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-49 037 686 (SHOWA DENKO K.K.) 11-10-1974, & JP49037686 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 69, no. 12, 16th September 1968, page 456, abstract no. 48877t, Columbus, Ohio, US; V.G. BORISOV: "Reaction of silicon dioxide with silicon carbide at 1870-2670 degrees K.", & TR. VSES. INST. NAUC.-ISSLED.PROEKT. RAB. OGNCUPOR. PROM. 1967, no. 39, 128-45 (RUSS) FROM REF, ZH., KHIM.. 1968, ABSTR. No. 4M16 | Examination | US3215522 |