EP0244709 - Display or indicating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1992 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAYCO PRODUCTS CANADA INC. 46 Norelco Drive Weston Ontario M9L 1S3 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | For all designated states DAYCO PRODUCTS CANADA INC. 46 Norelco Drive Weston, Ontario M9L 1S3 / CA | ||
Former [1987/46] | For all designated states NEI CANADA LIMITED 121 Industry Street Toronto Ontario / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Browne, John 21 Regan Crescent Georgetown Ontario / CA | 02 /
Wales, Thomas 34 Stavely Crescent Rexdale Ontario / CA | [1987/46] | Representative(s) | Sanderson, Michael John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Sanderson, Michael John, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1987/46] | Graham, John George Northern Engineering Industries plc Group Patents Department c/o International Research & Development Co. Ltd. Fossway Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE6 2YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 87105992.9 | 24.04.1987 | [1987/46] | Priority number, date | US19860857498 | 30.04.1986 Original published format: US 857498 | [1987/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0244709 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0244709 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G09F9/37 | [1987/46] | CPC: |
G09F9/375 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/46] | Title | German: | Anzeige oder Anzeigevorrichtung | [1987/46] | English: | Display or indicating device | [1987/46] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage ou de signalisation | [1987/46] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/16] | 12.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2735254 (STAVER CO); | [AD]US4223464 (WINROW DONALD); | [A]EP0163570 (LAFON SA [FR]) |