EP0249722 - Holder for a tool drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.1991 [1991/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBC Brown Boveri AG Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | [1987/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Björn, Niels de Place Huunenweg 460 CH-5242 Birr / CH | 02 /
Hüppi, Andreas Breitenrain 28 CH-5703 Seon / CH | [1987/52] | Application number, filing date | 87106208.9 | 29.04.1987 | [1987/52] | Priority number, date | CH19860002027 | 20.05.1986 Original published format: CH 202786 | [1987/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0249722 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0249722 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/08 | [1987/52] | CPC: |
B23B31/08 (EP);
B23B2220/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1987/52] | Title | German: | Halterung für einen Werkzeugantrieb | [1987/52] | English: | Holder for a tool drive | [1987/52] | French: | Porteur pour une commande d'outil | [1987/52] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/27] | 19.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.05.1987 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   02.07.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB435779 (WALTER KUMMER); | [A]FR2245226 (LEGALL BERNARD [FR]); | [A]DE2353707 (BECKER JOSEF); | [X]US4332066 (HAILEY SAMUEL I, et al) |