EP0249023 - Swirl chamber separator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bielefeldt, Ernst-August, Dipl.-Ing. Kieferngrund 20 D-21279 Hollenstedt / DE | [1987/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/51] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Bogatzky, Jürgen, et al Huth, Dietrich & Partner Lüneburger Tor 4 21073 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/51] | Schmidt-Bogatzky, Jürgen, Dr. Ing. Huth, Dietrich & Partner, et al Warburgstrasse 50 D-20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87106289.9 | 30.04.1987 | [1987/51] | Priority number, date | DE19863615747 | 09.05.1986 Original published format: DE 3615747 | [1987/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0249023 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0249023 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01D45/16, B01D53/24, B01D17/038, B04C5/13 | [1987/51] | CPC: |
B01D17/0217 (EP,US);
B01D21/0087 (EP,US);
B01D21/265 (EP,US);
B01D45/12 (EP,US);
B01D45/16 (EP,US);
B04C3/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/51] | Title | German: | Wirbelkammerabscheider | [1987/51] | English: | Swirl chamber separator | [1987/51] | French: | Séparateur à chambre de tourbillonnement | [1987/51] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1993/44: Teilanmeldung 91120013.7 eingereicht am 30/04/87 | EPB 1993/44: Divisional application 91120013.7 filed on 30/04/87 | EPB 1993/44: Demande divisionnaire 91120013.7 déposée le 30/04/87 | Examination procedure | 01.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/31] | 27.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP91120013.7 / EP0475467 | Opposition(s) | 04.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 04.05.1992 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.1992 | 30.04.1993 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 03.11.1993 | CH | 30.04.1994 | LI | 30.04.1994 | SE | 01.05.1994 | [2000/04] |
Former [1995/29] | CH | 30.04.1994 | |
LI | 30.04.1994 | ||
SE | 01.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | CH | 30.04.1994 | |
LI | 30.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2160415 [ ] (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | DE2832097 [ ] (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | DE3203498 [ ] (PILLER GMBH CO KG ANTON [DE]) | Examination | US3535850 | DE2206318 | DE2538664 |