Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.1991 [1991/38] |
11.08.1990 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.09.1990 [1990/39] |
19.10.1989 | Change - applicant | published on 06.12.1989 [1989/49] |
06.06.1989 | First examination report | |
11.10.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.11.1988 [1988/48] |
26.09.1988 | Publication of search report | published on 17.11.1988 [1988/46] |
21.11.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.01.1988 [1988/01] |