blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0253091

EP0253091 - Process for the separation of low molecular weight alcohols from aqueous solutions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.08.1991
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.09.1991 [1991/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
45764 Marl / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/03]For all designated states
HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-45764 Marl / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Sridhar, Srinivasan, Dr.
Lehmbecker Pfad 52
D-4370 Marl / DE
[1988/03]
Application number, filing date87106975.314.05.1987
[1988/03]
Priority number, dateDE1986362382715.07.1986         Original published format: DE 3623827
[1988/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0253091
Date:20.01.1988
Language:DE
[1988/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0253091
Date:06.07.1988
Language:DE
[1988/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0253091
Date:03.10.1990
Language:DE
[1990/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.1988
ClassificationIPC:C07C31/20, C07C29/76, C07C29/86, C07C29/80, C07C31/08
[1988/03]
CPC:
C07C29/76 (EP); C07C29/86 (EP)
C-Set:
C07C29/76, C07C31/08 (EP);
C07C29/76, C07C31/207 (EP);
C07C29/86, C07C31/08 (EP);
C07C29/86, C07C31/207 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1988/03]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Abtrennen von niedermolekularen Alkoholen aus wässrigen Lösungen[1988/03]
English:Process for the separation of low molecular weight alcohols from aqueous solutions[1988/03]
French:Procédé de séparation d'alcools à bas poids moléculaires de solution aqueuse[1988/03]
Examination procedure23.06.1988Examination requested  [1988/34]
22.01.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.04.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.05.1990Fee for grant paid
26.05.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.07.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE3112603  (BECKER GMBH & CO KG APPARATEBA [DE], et al);
 [A]DE3037736  (TUSEL GUENTER, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.