EP0290653 - Material web [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1991 [1991/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomas Josef Heimbach GmbH & Co. An Gut Nazareth 73 D-52353 Düren / DE | [1990/06] |
Former [1988/46] | For all designated states Thomas Josef Heimbach GmbH & Co. An Gut Nazareth 73 D-52353 Düren / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hälker, Helmut Rathausstrasse 16c D-5162 Niederzier / DE | [1988/46] | Representative(s) | Paul, Dieter-Alfred Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/46] | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Fichtestrasse 18 D-41464 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 87106979.5 | 14.05.1987 | [1988/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0290653 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0290653 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/00 | [1988/46] | CPC: |
B30B15/061 (EP,US);
D04B21/16 (EP,US);
D21F1/0027 (EP,US);
D10B2403/02412 (EP,US);
Y10T442/463 (EP,US);
Y10T442/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/46] | Title | German: | Materialbahn | [1988/46] | English: | Material web | [1988/46] | French: | Bande de matériaux | [1988/46] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 02.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB186813 (CHRISTFRIED PETZOLDT); | [A]US1811081 (HARTWELL RALF L); | [X]US2098993 (BARRELL WILLIAM A); | [A]EP0054206 (VENETO FELTRIFICIO SPA [IT]); | [XD]EP0059973 (COFPA [FR]); | [X]EP0106132 (HUYCK CORP [US]) |