EP0253976 - Track-guiding device for a track-bound vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 21.11.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1996 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 80976 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 D-80976 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/04] | For all designated states M.A.N. Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Dachauer Strasse 667 Postfach 50 06 20 D-8000 München 50 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thudt, Hubert Adenauerstrasse 32 D-8039 Puchheim/Bahnhof / DE | [1988/04] | Application number, filing date | 87106982.9 | 14.05.1987 | [1988/04] | Priority number, date | DE19863625283 | 25.07.1986 Original published format: DE 3625283 | [1988/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0253976 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0253976 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0253976 | Date: | 25.10.1991 | [1991/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B61F9/00, B62D1/26 | [1988/04] | CPC: |
B61F9/00 (EP,US);
B62D1/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/04] | Title | German: | Spurführungseinrichtung für ein spurführbares Fahrzeug | [1988/04] | English: | Track-guiding device for a track-bound vehicle | [1988/04] | French: | Dispositif de guidage à voie pour un véhicule guidable à voie | [1988/04] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/09] | 30.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.12.1989
04.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE Mercedes- Benz AG Postfach 600202 D-70302 Stuttgart / DE | [1990/06] | 24.01.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.05.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.05.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 20.07.1990 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 23.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 13.08.1991 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1992/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3103488 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) |