EP0246575 - Broadcaster with hopper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/48] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 D-49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dreyer, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. agr. Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 D-4507 Hasbergen / DE | [1987/48] | Representative(s) | Schuster, Thomas, et al Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | Schuster, Thomas, Dipl.-Phys., et al Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Patentanwälte Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87107098.3 | 15.05.1987 | [1987/48] | Priority number, date | DE19863617302 | 23.05.1986 Original published format: DE 3617302 | [1987/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0246575 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0246575 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0246575 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A01C17/00, A01C7/10 | [1987/48] | CPC: |
A01C17/006 (EP);
A01C17/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1987/48] | Title | German: | Schleuderstreuer mit Vorratsbehälter | [1987/48] | English: | Broadcaster with hopper | [1987/48] | French: | Distributeur à disques avec trémie | [1987/48] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/10: Teilanmeldung 91105418.7 eingereicht am 15/05/87 | EPB 1992/10: Divisional application 91105418.7 filed on 15/05/87 | EPB 1992/10: Demande divisionnaire 91105418.7 déposée le 15/05/87 | Examination procedure | 22.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/47] | 27.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 05.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP91105418.7 / EP0443634 | EP91105419.5 / EP0445842 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.12.1992
13.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE RAUCH Landmaschinenfabrik GmbH Postfach 11 62 D-76545 Sinzheim / DE Opponent's representative Lichti, Heiner, et al, et al Lichti - Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | 02
03.12.1992
17.12.1992
ADMISSIBLE C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL Opponent's representative Mulder, Herman, et al, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.12.1992
13.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE RAUCH Landmaschinenfabrik GmbH Postfach 11 62 D-76545 Sinzheim / DE Opponent's representative Lichti, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60 D-76207 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
02
03.12.1992
17.12.1992
ADMISSIBLE C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL Opponent's representative Mulder, Herman, et al, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | 14.12.1992 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 18.12.1992 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 19.01.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.05.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.03.1996 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1996/28] | 23.05.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 22.03.1994 | Appeal received No. T0260/94 | 07.06.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.03.1996 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 20.03.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.04.1996 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.05.1994 | SE | 16.05.1994 | [1995/29] |
Former [1995/15] | AT | 15.05.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]AU497267B (DICKEY); | [Y]DE2817779 (NORDSTEN AS P); | [A]EP0084872 (WEICHEL ERNST); | [Y]EP0088480 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]); | [A]EP0127922 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]); | [A]EP0176117 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) |