EP0246608 - Low molecular weight polymers and copolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.1991 [1991/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GLIDDEN COMPANY 925 Euclid Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44115 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/48] | For all designated states THE GLIDDEN COMPANY 925 Euclid Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, Ju-Chui 6762 West Haskell Drive Fairview Pennsylvania / US | 02 /
Abbey, Kirk Joseph P.O. Box 5527 Cary North Carolina / US | [1987/48] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/48] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87107260.9 | 19.05.1987 | [1987/48] | Priority number, date | US19860865555 | 21.05.1986 Original published format: US 865555 | [1987/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0246608 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0246608 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/38 | [1987/48] | CPC: |
C08F4/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/48] | Title | German: | Polymere und Copolymere mit niedrigem Molekulargewicht | [1987/48] | English: | Low molecular weight polymers and copolymers | [1987/48] | French: | Polymères et copolymères de poids moléculaire bas | [1987/48] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 19.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/41] | 08.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/31] | 01.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4526945 (CARLSON GARY M [US], et al) |