EP0291555 - Fingernail cosmetic composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1993 [1993/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamazaki, Kazunori c/o Shiseido Laboratories 1050 Nippa-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Muneo c/o Shiseido Laboratories 1050 Nippa-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Okunuki, Yutaka c/o Shiseido Laboratories 1050 Nippa-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Soyama, Yoshikazu c/o Shiseido Laboratories 1050 Nippa-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Ishiwatari, Masaaki c/o Shiseido Laboratories 1050 Nippa-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1988/47] | Representative(s) | Brandes, Jürgen, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | Brandes, Jürgen, Dr. rer. nat., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/10] | Brandes, Jürgen, Dr. c/o Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-8000 München 90 / DE | ||
Former [1988/47] | Bartels, Hans Patentanwälte Phys.H.Bartels,Dipl.-Ing.H.Fink,Dr.-Ing.M.Held Dipl.-Ing.M.Bartels Lange Strasse 51 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 87107413.4 | 21.05.1987 | [1988/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0291555 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0291555 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/043 | [1988/47] | CPC: |
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/64 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61Q3/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/47] | Title | German: | Kosmetisches Mittel für Nägel | [1988/47] | English: | Fingernail cosmetic composition | [1988/47] | French: | Composition cosmétique pour les ongles | [1988/47] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 03.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | AU64458B [ ]; | US3342686 [ ] (JEWEL PAUL W, et al); | LU78659 [ ]; | FR2419758 [ ] (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]); | FR2537871 [ ] (FABER CASTELL A W [DE]); | EP0140325 [ ] (KAO CORP [JP]) | Examination | LU78679 | - List, Arzneiformenlehre, Wissenschaftliche Verlagsgesellschaft MbH Stuttgart 1985, Seite 498 |