EP0291556 - Process for removing phosphate from waters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KERNFORSCHUNGSZENTRUM KARLSRUHE GMBH Postfach 36 40 D-76050 Karlsruhe / DE | [1988/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rieger, Joachim, Dr. Holbornweg 2 D-3400 Göttingen / DE | 02 /
Eberle, Siegfried, Prof. Dr. Luisenstrasse 43 D-7514 Eggenstein / DE | 03 /
Donnert, Dietfried, Dr. Boeckhstrasse 20 D-7500 Karlsruhe / DE | [1988/47] | Application number, filing date | 87107455.5 | 22.05.1987 | [1988/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0291556 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/52 | [1988/47] | CPC: |
C02F5/02 (EP);
C02F1/5236 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1988/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung von Phosphat aus Wässern | [1988/47] | English: | Process for removing phosphate from waters | [1988/47] | French: | Procédé pour éliminer le phosphate d'eaux | [1988/47] | File destroyed: | 25.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 21.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/03] | 16.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/26] | 11.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3023968 ; | [A]GB2021087 ; | [A]US3562015 |