Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0273095
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
20.03.1992 |
Change - withdrawal |
published on 13.05.1992 [1992/20] |
18.03.1992 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] |
05.04.1991 |
Change or deletion - publication of A document |
published on 22.05.1991 [1991/21] |
05.04.1991 |
Change or deletion - publication of B1 document |
published on 05.04.1991 [1991/21] |
09.03.1991 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.04.1991 [1991/17] |
17.04.1989 |
First examination report |
|
19.08.1988 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.10.1988 [1988/40] |
21.05.1988 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.07.1988 [1988/27] |