EP0254836 - Europium activated barium strontium magnesium fluorobromide photostimulable phosphor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GTE Products Corporation 100 West 10th Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [1988/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reddy, Vaddi Butchi 120 Vista Dr. Apt. 5 Sayre, PA 18840 / US | 02 /
Bueno, Clifford 316 Escuela Avenue Apt. 35 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 03 /
Karam, Ronald Edward R.D. 1 Box 212 Towanda, PA 18848 / US | [1988/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/05] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87107764.0 | 27.05.1987 | [1988/05] | Priority number, date | US19860880522 | 30.06.1986 Original published format: US 880522 | [1988/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0254836 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0254836 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/85 | [1988/05] | CPC: |
C09K11/7733 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1988/05] | Title | German: | Photoerregbarer mit Europium aktivierter Barium-Strontium-Magnesium-Fluorbromidleuchtstoff | [1988/05] | English: | Europium activated barium strontium magnesium fluorobromide photostimulable phosphor | [1988/05] | French: | Matériau photoluminescent à base de fluorobromure de barium strontium magnésium activé à l'europium | [1988/05] | Examination procedure | 27.05.1987 | Examination requested [1988/05] | 02.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]NL8302536 ; | [X]EP0159014 ; | [X]EP0159015 ; | [X]EP0021342 ; | [X]FR2430969 |