EP0250895 - Method and instrument for the preparation of a filter with several pleats [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.1990 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drägerwerk Aktiengesellschaft 23542 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | For all designated states Drägerwerk Aktiengesellschaft D-23542 Lübeck / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlör, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Weiter Lohberg 5 D-2400 Lübeck / DE | 02 /
Pantaleon-Stemberg, Gerd Fichtestrasse 6 D-2410 Mölln / DE | [1988/01] | Application number, filing date | 87107938.0 | 02.06.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | DE19863622356 | 03.07.1986 Original published format: DE 3622356 | [1988/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0250895 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0250895 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/14, B01D39/18, B01D29/06, D21J3/12, D21F11/14 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
D21J3/12 (EP,US);
B01D39/14 (EP,US);
B01D39/18 (EP,US);
Y10S264/48 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/01] | B01D29/06, B01D39/18, D21F11/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines mehrere Falten aufweisenden Filters und Werkzeug hierzu | [1988/01] | English: | Method and instrument for the preparation of a filter with several pleats | [1988/01] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un filtre avec plusieurs plis et outil correspondant | [1988/01] | File destroyed: | 30.10.1997 | Examination procedure | 22.06.1987 | Examination requested [1988/01] | 18.01.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2079667 (SWIFT JR GEORGE W); | [A]US1175001 (MANGELSDORFF FREDERICK W [US]); | [A]US891331 (EMRICK FRANK C [US]); | [A]DE3403738 (SCHAFFT HELMUT); | [AD]DD79 ; | [AD]DE727678 (DRAEGERWERK HEINR U BERNH, et al) |