EP0250900 - Distributor for telecommunication arrangements with light wave guides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steiner, Ewald, Ing.(grad.) Fichtenweg 1 D-8137 Berg 3 / DE | [1988/01] | Application number, filing date | 87107982.8 | 02.06.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | DE19863621168 | 25.06.1986 Original published format: DE 3621168 | [1988/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0250900 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0250900 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
G02B6/4454 (EP);
G02B6/44528 (EP);
G02B6/44524 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1988/01] | Title | German: | Verteiler für Telekommunikationsanlagen mit Lichtwellenleitern | [1988/01] | English: | Distributor for telecommunication arrangements with light wave guides | [1988/01] | French: | Distributeur pour des arrangements de télécommunication avec guides d'ondes lumineuses | [1988/01] | File destroyed: | 28.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 03.01.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/25] | 26.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS58113904 ; | [X]FR2515466 (LIGNES TELEGRAPH TELEPHON [FR]); | [X]EP0149250 (SEDLBAUER WILHELM GMBH [DE]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN Band 7Nr. 220 (P-226)(1365) 30 September 1983; & JP-A-58 113 904 (HIROSHI SUNAYAMA) 07-07-1983 |