EP0249795 - Method for a communication system, especially for a private telephone system, in which at times a switching to changed traffic possibilities occurs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muyssen, John, Dipl.-Ing. Draaitopstrasse 61 B-9050 Evergem / BE | [1987/52] | Application number, filing date | 87107983.6 | 02.06.1987 | [1987/52] | Priority number, date | DE19863620605 | 20.06.1986 Original published format: DE 3620605 | [1987/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0249795 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0249795 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0249795 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/62, H04M3/38, H04Q3/545 | [1987/52] | CPC: |
H04M3/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren für ein Kommunikationssystem, insbesondere für ein Fernsprechnebenstellensystem, bei dem zeitweise eine Umschaltung auf geänderte Verkehrsmöglichkeiten erfolgt | [1987/52] | English: | Method for a communication system, especially for a private telephone system, in which at times a switching to changed traffic possibilities occurs | [1987/52] | French: | Méthode pour un système de communication, en particulier pour un système téléphonique privé dans lequel de temps en temps une commutation vers des possibilités de trafic modifiées a lieu | [1987/52] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/03] | 10.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP61001155 ; | [A]JP57201361 ; | [Y]DE2830282 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US4486626 (KOHLER JOYLEE E [US]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 10, Nr. 137 (E-405)[2194], 21. Mai 1986; & JP-A-61 001 155 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 07-01-1986, & JP61001155 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 52 (E-162)[1197], 2. März 1983; & JP-A-57 201 361 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 09-12-1982, & JP57201361 A 00000000 |