EP0249801 - Rolling mill for producing a rolled strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/52] | Rolling mill for producing a rolling stock, in particular a rolled strip | ||
[1990/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1991 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1991 [1991/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [1987/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feldmann, Hugo, Dr. Teutonenstrasse 11 D-5110 Alsdorf-Warden / DE | 02 /
Schultes, Tilmann, Dr. Bechermühle D-5650 Solingen 19 / DE | 03 /
Beisemann, Gerd, Dr. Am Seeblick 19 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | [1987/52] | Representative(s) | Müller, Gerd, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 D-57072 Siegen / DE | [1987/52] | Application number, filing date | 87108001.6 | 03.06.1987 | [1987/52] | Priority number, date | DE19863620197 | 16.06.1986 Original published format: DE 3620197 | [1987/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0249801 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0249801 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B21B13/14 | [1987/52] | CPC: |
B21B13/142 (EP,US);
B21B13/147 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/52] | Title | German: | Walzwerk zur Herstellung eines Walzbandes | [1990/15] | English: | Rolling mill for producing a rolled strip | [1990/15] | French: | Laminoir pour la fabrication d'un feuillard de laminage | [1990/15] |
Former [1987/52] | Walzwerk zur Herstellung eines Walzgutes, insbesondere eines Walzbandes | ||
Former [1987/52] | Rolling mill for producing a rolling stock, in particular a rolled strip | ||
Former [1987/52] | Laminoir pour la fabrication d'une matière à laminer, en particulier d'un feuillard de laminage | Examination procedure | 22.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 22.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5630014 ; | [AD]EP0091540 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]); | [A]EP0153849 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 5, Nr. 83 (M-71)[755], 30. Mai 1981; & JP - A - 56 30014 (KOBE SEIKOSHO) 26.03.1981, & JP5630014 A 00000000 |