EP0249803 - Device for controlling the advancing speed towards a work piece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.08.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): CH, LI | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MESELTRON S.A. Avenue Beauregard 14/18 CH-2035 Corcelles / CH | [1987/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wegmann, Heinz Rümelbachstrasse 17 CH-8153 Rümlang / CH | [1987/52] | Representative(s) | de Raemy, Jacques, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | de Raemy, Jacques, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 CH-2074 Marin / CH | ||
Former [1987/52] | de Raemy, Jacques ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Passage Max. Meuron 6 CH-2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 87108003.2 | 03.06.1987 | [1987/52] | Priority number, date | FR19860008534 | 11.06.1986 Original published format: FR 8608534 | [1987/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0249803 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0249803 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q15/22 | [1987/52] | CPC: |
B24B49/003 (EP,US);
B23Q15/225 (EP,US);
B23Q17/2241 (EP);
B24B47/20 (EP,US);
B24B47/22 (EP,US);
Y10S82/904 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1987/52] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Steuerung der Näherungsgeschwindigkeit an ein Werkstück | [1987/52] | English: | Device for controlling the advancing speed towards a work piece | [1987/52] | French: | Dispositif pour la commande de la vitesse d'avance d'un outil vers une pièce à usiner | [1987/52] | Examination procedure | 11.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 20.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.1991
17.09.1991
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.1991
17.09.1991
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 23.09.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.10.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.11.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.1992 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 27.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 07.05.1993 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1993/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.06.1992 | CH | 30.06.1992 | LI | 30.06.1992 | DE | 02.03.1993 | [2002/42] |
Former [2002/16] | CH | 14.11.1990 | |
LI | 14.11.1990 | ||
GB | 03.06.1992 | ||
DE | 02.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/46] | GB | 03.06.1992 | |
CH | 30.06.1992 | ||
LI | 30.06.1992 | ||
DE | 02.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/28] | CH | 30.06.1992 | |
LI | 30.06.1992 | ||
DE | 02.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/13] | CH | 30.06.1992 | |
LI | 30.06.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2306791 (MOVOMATIC SA [CH]); | [A]FR2287679 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) | by applicant | CH585609 | FR2382310 |