EP0248423 - Process or the acylation of aromatic compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.1990 [1990/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/50] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eggersdorfer, Manfred, Dr. Hannongstrasse 18 D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
Siegel, Hardo, Dr. Hans-Purrmann-Allee 25 D-6720 Speyer / DE | 03 /
Schuhmacher, Alfred, Dr. Von-Weber-Strasse 36 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
Grosch, Walter, Dr. Starenweg 1 D-6803 Edingen-Neckarhausen / DE | 05 /
Henkelmann, Jochem, Dr. Ludwigshafener Strasse 44 D-6704 Mutterstadt / DE | [1987/50] | Application number, filing date | 87108066.9 | 04.06.1987 | [1987/50] | Priority number, date | DE19863619169 | 06.06.1986 Original published format: DE 3619169 | DE19863642329 | 11.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3642329 | [1987/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0248423 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0248423 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/46, C07C49/76, C07C65/34, C07C51/373 | [1987/50] | CPC: |
C07C51/373 (EP,US);
C07B37/02 (KR);
C07C45/46 (EP,US);
C07C49/76 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/373, C07C65/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Acylierung von Aromaten | [1987/50] | English: | Process or the acylation of aromatic compounds | [1987/50] | French: | Procédé d'acylation d'aromates | [1987/50] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/50] | 13.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1288584 (AKAD WISSENSCHAFTEN DDR); | [AD]DE2720294 (YAMAMOTO KAGAKU GOSEI KK); | [X]EP0012850 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]US4310705 (NISSEN AXEL, et al) |