EP0248441 - Pay TV scrambling by audio encryption [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.1994 [1994/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OCI Communications, Inc. 16516 Via Esprillo San Diego, California / US | [1992/23] |
Former [1987/50] | For all designated states OAK INDUSTRIES INC. 16935 West Bernardo Drive Rancho Bernardo California / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davidov, Mircho A. 1209 Robyn Drive Danville California 94526 / US | [1987/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/50] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87108138.6 | 04.06.1987 | [1987/50] | Priority number, date | US19860870866 | 05.06.1986 Original published format: US 870866 | [1987/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0248441 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0248441 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0248441 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16 | [1987/50] | CPC: |
H04N7/167 (EP,US);
H04N21/4341 (EP,US);
H04N21/439 (EP,US);
H04N7/1675 (EP,US);
H04N21/4345 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1987/50] | Title | German: | Gebührenfernsehverschlüsselung mittels Tonchiffrierung | [1987/50] | English: | Pay TV scrambling by audio encryption | [1987/50] | French: | Brouillage de télévision à péage par chiffrage de son | [1987/50] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/21] | 05.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0053885 (GEN INSTRUMENT JERROLD DIV [US]); | [A]US4410911 (FIELD ROBERT W [US], et al) |