EP0249189 - Membrane for hemodialysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/51] | Hemodialysis method and membrane | ||
[1992/12] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.12.1997 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/51] | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kataoka, Hiroshi 2-4-21, Tsunishi Kamakura-shi Kanagawa-ken 248 / JP | 02 /
Kunitomo, Tetsunosuke 2-2-24, Tsunishi Kamakura-shi Kanagawa-ken 248 / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Takuichi 2093-120, Bodaiji Kousei-cho Kouka-gun Shiga-ken 520-32 / JP | [1987/51] | Representative(s) | Coleiro, Raymond, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/42] | Coleiro, Raymond, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1989/49] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/51] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87108296.2 | 09.06.1987 | [1987/51] | Priority number, date | JP19860136125 | 13.06.1986 Original published format: JP 13612586 | JP19860151679 | 30.06.1986 Original published format: JP 15167986 | [1987/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0249189 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0249189 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0249189 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/16 | [1987/51] | CPC: |
A61M1/16 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/1631 (KR);
A61M1/1623 (KR);
B01D61/243 (KR);
B01D69/02 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/4011 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1987/51] | Title | German: | Hämodialyse-Membran | [1992/12] | English: | Membrane for hemodialysis | [1992/12] | French: | Membrane de dialyse | [1992/12] |
Former [1987/51] | Dialysemethode und Membran | ||
Former [1987/51] | Hemodialysis method and membrane | ||
Former [1987/51] | Méthode de dialyse et membrane | Examination procedure | 18.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/25] | 19.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.1992
22.12.1992
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel Faser AG Kasinostrasse 19 - 21 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE | 02
18.12.1992
11.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius AG 61343 Bad Homburg v.d. Höhe / DE Opponent's representative Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.1992
22.12.1992
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel Faser AG Kasinostrasse 19 - 21 D-42103 Wuppertal / DE | ||
02
18.12.1992
11.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius AG D-61343 Bad Homburg v.d. Höhe / DE Opponent's representative Luderschmidt & Partner Patentanwälte, Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | |||
Former [1994/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.1992
22.12.1992
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel Faser AG Kasinostrasse 19 - 21 D-42103 Wuppertal / DE | ||
02
18.12.1992
11.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius AG D-61343 Bad Homburg v.d. Höhe / DE Opponent's representative Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing. Weiss Patentanwälte, et al, et al Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | |||
Former [1993/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.1992
Akzo Faser AG Fachbereich Patentwesen Postfach 10 01 49 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE | ||
02
18.12.1992
Fresenius AG D-61343 Bad Homburg v.d. Höhe / DE Opponent's representative Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing. Weiss Patentanwälte, et al, et al Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | |||
Former [1993/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.1992
Akzo Faser AG Fachbereich Patentwesen Postfach 10 01 49 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE | 13.01.1993 | No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 19.01.1993 | No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 26.01.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.07.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.08.1993 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 23.10.1993 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 14.06.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.07.1994 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 12.11.1997 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1998/05] | Appeal following opposition | 23.08.1994 | Appeal received No. T0710/94 | 11.11.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.11.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 12.11.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.11.1997 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 18.03.1992 | |
LI | 18.03.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57056039 ; | [A]US4059512 (HARRIS NICK S); | [A]EP0012630 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) | Examination | JP5756039 |