EP0249852 - Terminal provided with a printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.1993 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO. 10, Tsuchido-cho Hanazono Ukyo-ku Kyoto 616 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | For all designated states OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO. 10, Tsuchido-cho Hanazono Ukyo-ku Kyoto 616 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moroe, Tomomi Omron Tateisi Electronics Co. Patent Center 20, Igadera Shimo-Kaiinnji Nagaokakyo-City Kyoto 617 / JP | [1987/52] | Representative(s) | Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87108298.8 | 09.06.1987 | [1987/52] | Priority number, date | JP19860087741U | 09.06.1986 Original published format: JP 8774186 U | [1987/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0249852 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0249852 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0249852 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, H05K5/00, G06F15/40, B41J29/06 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
B41J29/06 (EP,US);
G06K21/00 (KR);
G06F1/181 (EP,US);
H05K5/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1987/52] | H05K5/00, G06F7/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/52] | Title | German: | Mit einem Drucker versehenes Terminal | [1987/52] | English: | Terminal provided with a printer | [1987/52] | French: | Terminal muni d'une imprimante | [1987/52] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 04.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.04.1992 | BE | 01.04.1992 | CH | 01.04.1992 | GR | 01.04.1992 | LI | 01.04.1992 | NL | 01.04.1992 | SE | 01.04.1992 | LU | 30.06.1992 | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 01.04.1992 | |
BE | 01.04.1992 | ||
CH | 01.04.1992 | ||
LI | 01.04.1992 | ||
NL | 01.04.1992 | ||
SE | 01.04.1992 | ||
LU | 30.06.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | AT | 01.04.1992 | |
BE | 01.04.1992 | ||
CH | 01.04.1992 | ||
LI | 01.04.1992 | ||
NL | 01.04.1992 | ||
SE | 01.04.1992 | ||
Former [1993/01] | BE | 01.04.1992 | |
CH | 01.04.1992 | ||
LI | 01.04.1992 | ||
NL | 01.04.1992 | ||
SE | 01.04.1992 | ||
Former [1992/48] | CH | 01.04.1992 | |
LI | 01.04.1992 | ||
NL | 01.04.1992 | ||
SE | 01.04.1992 | ||
Former [1992/47] | CH | 01.04.1992 | |
LI | 01.04.1992 | ||
SE | 01.04.1992 | ||
Former [1992/41] | CH | 01.04.1992 | |
LI | 01.04.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59038822 ; | [A]US4143382 (BRILL KLAUS, et al); | [A]DE8011008U | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2, no. 137 (P.282)(1574), 26 June 1984; & JP - A - 59 038 822 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO) 02-03-1984, & JP59038822 A 19840626 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN vol. 27, no. 1A, June 1984, page 39; J.P. GILVEY et al.: "Display detachable printer stand" |