EP0249197 - Cutter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.1990 [1990/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DISCO ABRASIVE SYSTEMS, LTD. 14-3 Higashi Kojiya 2-chome Ota-Ku Tokyo 144 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/51] | For all designated states DISCO ABRASIVE SYSTEMS, LTD. 14-3 Higashi Kojiya 2-chome Ota-Ku Tokyo 144 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yukawa, Isao 20-30 Sakae-cho 1-chome Odawara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Tada, Yasuji Daini Azumaso, B-101 5-16 Kamisoyagi 1-chome Yamato-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1987/51] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/51] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87108328.3 | 10.06.1987 | [1987/51] | Priority number, date | JP19860132655 | 10.06.1986 Original published format: JP 13265586 | JP19870005050 | 14.01.1987 Original published format: JP 505087 | [1987/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0249197 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0249197 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C03B33/04 | [1987/51] | CPC: |
B23B5/00 (KR);
B23Q7/043 (EP,US);
B24B7/00 (KR);
B25B11/005 (EP,US);
B28D1/041 (EP,US);
B28D7/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/51] | Title | German: | Schneideinrichtung | [1987/51] | English: | Cutter | [1987/51] | French: | Dispositif de coupage | [1987/51] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/20] | 27.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0036313 (ASHTON JACQUELINE [ES]); | [A]DE3320234 (SERVICE ENG LTD [GB]); | [A]US4328726 (PEARL DAVID R); | [A]GB686372 (SONAPAR SOC DE PARTICIPATION); | [A]CH602304 (FORBETON BETONBOHR SA) |