EP0249221 - Assembling method of a piezoelectric module with contacts for an ink jet recorder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/51] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meinhof, André-Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. Pannierstrasse 7 D-1000 Berlin 44 / DE | [1987/51] | Application number, filing date | 87108401.8 | 10.06.1987 | [1987/51] | Priority number, date | DE19863619859 | 13.06.1986 Original published format: DE 3619859 | DE19863619891 | 13.06.1986 Original published format: DE 3619891 | DE19863619925 | 13.06.1986 Original published format: DE 3619925 | [1987/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0249221 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0249221 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/04, H01L41/04 | [1989/39] | CPC: |
B41J2/1429 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/51] | B41J3/04 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aufbau einer fertig kontaktierten Piezobaugruppe für Tintenschreibköpfe | [1987/51] | English: | Assembling method of a piezoelectric module with contacts for an ink jet recorder | [1987/51] | French: | Méthode d'assemblage d'un module piézoélectrique à contacts pour tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre | [1987/51] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 27.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 03.01.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/27] | 07.02.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.07.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3433536 ; | [A]DE3324043 |