EP0258550 - Central lubrication system for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1993 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lincoln GmbH Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse Postfach 1263 D-6909 Walldorf / DE | [1988/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ostermeyer, Günter c/o KEIL & SCHAAFSHAUSEN Patentanwälte Ammelburgstrasse 34 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 1 / DE | 02 /
Rodemer, Karl c/o KEIL & SCHAAFSHAUSEN Patentanwälte Ammelburgstrasse 34 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 1 / DE | 03 /
Steiger, Peter c/o KEIL & SCHAAFSHAUSEN Patentanwälte Ammelburgstrasse 34 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 1 / DE | [1988/10] | Representative(s) | Keil, Rainer A., et al KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN, Patentanwälte, Cronstettenstrasse 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/10] | Keil, Rainer A., Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Eysseneckstrasse 31 D-60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 87108440.6 | 11.06.1987 | [1988/10] | Priority number, date | DE19863630327 | 05.09.1986 Original published format: DE 3630327 | [1988/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0258550 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0258550 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0258550 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60R17/02 | [1988/10] | CPC: |
B60R17/02 (EP,US);
F16N2230/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/10] | Title | German: | Zentralschmieranlage für Fahrzeuge | [1988/10] | English: | Central lubrication system for vehicles | [1988/10] | French: | Dispositif de graissage central pour véhicules | [1988/10] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/26] | 18.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 20.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 18.03.1992 | LU | 30.06.1992 | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/52] | LU | 30.06.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2458711 (ASSA AB); | [A]EP0131910 (TECALEMIT GMBH DEUTSCHE [DE]) |