EP0249894 - Ski [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.1992 [1992/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Feldmühle Aktiengesellschaft Fritz-Vomfelde-Platz 4 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [1987/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolfgang, Burger, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Laichleweg 22 D-7314 Plochingen / DE | 02 /
Wloka, Gert Jahnstrasse 59 D-7302 Ostfildern 3 / DE | 03 /
Sommer, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Schorndorfer Strasse 28/1 D-7313 Reichenbach / DE | [1991/12] |
Former [1987/52] | 01 /
Wolfgang, Burger, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Laichleweg 22 D-7314 Wernau / DE | ||
02 /
Wloka, Gert Jahnstrasse 59 D-7302 Ostfildern 3 / DE | |||
03 /
Sommer, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Schorndorfer Strasse 28/1 D-7313 Reichenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 87108464.6 | 11.06.1987 | [1987/52] | Priority number, date | DE19863620091 | 14.06.1986 Original published format: DE 3620091 | [1987/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0249894 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0249894 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0249894 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A63C5/048 | [1987/52] | CPC: |
A63C5/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, SE [1987/52] | Title | German: | Ski | [1987/52] | English: | Ski | [1987/52] | French: | Ski | [1987/52] | Examination procedure | 24.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 20.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.03.1991 | [1992/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1578902 (SIMON FA KARL); | [A]FR2124650 (OLIN AUTHIER SA); | [A]AT339793B (STUGGER WALTER F [US], et al) |