EP0254023 - Apparatus for feeding and metering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANG APPARATEBAU GMBH Raiffeisenstrasse 7 D-83313 Siegsdorf / DE | [1988/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bödecker, Kay Lindenstrasse 20 D-8224 Chieming / DE | 02 /
Scheurl, Robert Kienau 4 D-8221 Inzell / DE | 03 /
Strasser, Hans-Erwin Lerchmoosstrasse 8a D-8227 Diegsdorf / DE | [1988/04] | Representative(s) | Härle, Horst c/o Henkel KGaA TFP/Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/04] | Härle, Horst, Dr. c/o Henkel KGaA TFP/Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 87108563.5 | 13.06.1987 | [1988/04] | Priority number, date | DE19863620900 | 21.06.1986 Original published format: DE 3620900 | [1988/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0254023 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0254023 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/44 | [1988/04] | CPC: |
A47L15/4436 (EP,US);
B01F21/22 (EP,US);
Y10T137/4891 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1988/04] | Title | German: | Einspül- und Dosiergerät | [1988/04] | English: | Apparatus for feeding and metering | [1988/04] | French: | Appareil pour remblayage et dosage | [1988/04] | Examination procedure | 13.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 10.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.06.1991 | GB | 13.06.1991 | BE | 30.06.1991 | CH | 30.06.1991 | LI | 30.06.1991 | LU | 30.06.1991 | [1999/52] |
Former [1993/03] | AT | 13.06.1991 | |
GB | 13.06.1991 | ||
BE | 30.06.1991 | ||
CH | 30.06.1991 | ||
LI | 30.06.1991 | ||
Former [1992/36] | GB | 13.06.1991 | |
BE | 30.06.1991 | ||
CH | 30.06.1991 | ||
LI | 30.06.1991 | ||
Former [1992/34] | GB | 13.06.1991 | |
CH | 30.06.1991 | ||
LI | 30.06.1991 | ||
Former [1992/16] | CH | 30.06.1991 | |
LI | 30.06.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2656413 (ECONOMICS LAB); | [A]EP0058507 (BERELSON RUDOLPH); | [A]DE8405194U |